U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-04032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BORRELLI
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 24, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 24, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 23, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order to Unseal Case]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order to Seal Case]
  • May 23, 2022: [Complaint (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.