U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-12118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GONZALEZ-ARIS et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 09, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Bond]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 26, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 02, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • August 02, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 02, 2022: [Arrest ]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 24, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.