U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-09195-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 20, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 17, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 25, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 19, 2022: [Certification]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 29, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 23, 2022: [Certification]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 03, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 01, 2022: [Bond]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 01, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.