U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-16037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LATTIFF
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 22, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.