U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-02025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DUPREE MARTIN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 27, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • May 27, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 27, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order]
  • May 27, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.