U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-15110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BLISSITT
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 01, 2022: [Bond]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 31, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 31, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • May 31, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.