U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-13128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LUGO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 07, 2022: [Transcript]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 20, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 02, 2022: [Bond]
  • June 02, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 01, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.