U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-16062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SOSA DIAZ et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 03, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Bond]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 22, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 22, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order]
  • June 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 22, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Appointed]
  • June 22, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.