U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-08201-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SINGHA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 02, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order to Seal Case]
  • June 02, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.