U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-08171-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TERRERO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 03, 2022: [Bond]
  • June 03, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.