U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-10236-1
  • Case Name: USA v. OMAR JARYD VILLEGAS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 14, 2022: [Bond]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 09, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.