U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-05009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MALONEY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 10, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 10, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.