U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-05006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOHN SINGLETON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Bond]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 16, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 10, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 10, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.