U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-10255-1
  • Case Name: USA v. REED
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 13, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.