U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-15138-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BROWN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Letter]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Letter]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order]
  • June 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 28, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.