U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-15142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CONRAD
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 02, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 16, 2022: [Bond]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 16, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.