U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-10178-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HOYOS-JAIMES, et al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 21, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 21, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Application and Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • November 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 23, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.