U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-12168-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MIRZA et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Interpreter Appointed]
  • June 27, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [Bond]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 27, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 27, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order]
  • June 24, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 24, 2022: [Bond]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 24, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.