U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mc-00060
  • Case Name: 1199SEIU UNITED HEALTHCARE WORKERS EAST v. ALARIS HEALTH AT HAMILTON PARK et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Writ of Execution Returned Executed]
  • August 11, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Letter Request to issue Writ of Execution]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Writ of Execution Issued]
  • June 30, 2022: [Letter Request to issue Writ of Execution]
  • June 24, 2022: [Registration of Foreign Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.