U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-09234-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GUARDADO-CALLES
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 03, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 28, 2022: [Bond]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 27, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.