U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-09233-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VELEZ-PENA et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 20, 2022: [Appear]
  • July 15, 2022: [Appear]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 30, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 27, 2022: [Bond]
  • June 27, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 27, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.