U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-12195-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HERNANDEZ
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Appointed]
  • August 25, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.