U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-04041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SAUNDERS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 06, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 06, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order]
  • June 30, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • June 30, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 30, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.