U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-06034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DEAS et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 06, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 27, 2022: [Release from Custody]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 12, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 12, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • July 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 12, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 12, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.