U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-16077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KING
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 12, 2023: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 13, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.