U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-09239-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JACKSON et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 14, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 14, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.