U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-13152-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MANN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 07, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 18, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.