U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-16018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. O'NEIL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 22, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 22, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 18, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 18, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 17, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.