U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-12212-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FLORES
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 22, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order]
  • July 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 19, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Appointed]
  • July 19, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • July 17, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.