U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-09201-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COSTANZA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 09, 2023: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 20, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 20, 2022: [Bond]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 20, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 20, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 20, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.