U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-12243-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SIMO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 04, 2022: [Docket Annotation (public)]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Revoke]
  • September 20, 2022: [Transcript]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 01, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 25, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 25, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.