U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-12263-1
  • Case Name: USA v. AVILA ALVARADO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 07, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 25, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Appointed]
  • July 25, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.