U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-13162-1
  • Case Name: USA v. AWAD
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Application/Petition]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Application/Petition]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 29, 2022: [Order]
  • October 29, 2022: [Application/Petition]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 13, 2022: [Bond]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 13, 2022: [Arrest ]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 04, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • July 26, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 26, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.