U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-09280-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 27, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 27, 2022: [Bond]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 27, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order]
  • July 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 26, 2022: [Bond]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 26, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 26, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order]
  • July 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 26, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 26, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.