U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-17045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TURLINGTON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 15, 2022: [Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 22, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 28, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Bond]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • August 01, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 29, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • July 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 29, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 29, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 29, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • July 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order to Unseal Case]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order to Seal Case]
  • July 28, 2022: [Complaint (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.