U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-08301-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WANG, et al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 17, 2022: [Agreement to Forfeit Property]
  • August 17, 2022: [Bond]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 17, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order to Seal Case]
  • August 17, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.