U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-04044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ESPASINO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Transcript]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • September 27, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 27, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 27, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 22, 2022: [Release from Custody]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 19, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 19, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 19, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • August 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order to Unseal Case]
  • August 19, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.