U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-08280-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DUTTON et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 29, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Release from Custody]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Bond]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 23, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 23, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 23, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order to Seal Case]
  • August 23, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.