U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-11228-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SHIND
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Revoke]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 24, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 24, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order to Seal Case]
  • August 24, 2022: [Complaint (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.