U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-13221-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WHYTE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 05, 2023: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 25, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Bond]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 25, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 25, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • August 25, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.