U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-11243-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RODRIGUEZ
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 07, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 05, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 05, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.