U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-16159-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NINA GONZALEZ
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2024: [Text Order]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 20, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 20, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 16, 2022: [Complaint]
  • September 16, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.