U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-mj-03003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. AXALCO-HUERTA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order of Dismissal]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 17, 2023: [Brady Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Waiver of Rule 5 Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 17, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 09, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.