U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-mj-11139-3
  • Case Name: USA v. MORAN, et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • April 22, 2025: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Interpreter Appointed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Text Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2025
  • January 07, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.