U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-02859
  • Case Name: KOSTOPOULOS v. NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Update Answer Due Deadline]
  • May 06, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 02, 2025: [Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 22, 2025: [QC - Fillable PDF]
  • April 18, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 18, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.