U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-14069
  • Case Name: Matthew Delrio
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sklar, Andrew [BNC Certificate of Notice (generic)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sklar, Andrew [Meeting of Creditors Adjourned (Continued)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Biase, Donald V. [Hearing Withdrawn (Document) ]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Biase, Donald V. [Missing Document(s) Filed]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Biase, Donald V. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Biase, Donald V. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order ]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Biase, Donald V. [Automatic Assignment - Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 7]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Biase, Donald V. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Biase, Donald V. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Biase, Donald V. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Biase, Donald V. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.