Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York

  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:1:16-cv-01520
    Party Name:Park v. FDM Group Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:October 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Plan]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:August 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:July 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:March 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Stay of Appeal]
    Date Published:May 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File]
    Date Published:April 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appeal Fee Paid via Pay.gov]
    Date Published:April 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
    Date Published:April 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corrected Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:April 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Appeal]
    Date Published:April 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:April 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:April 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - Clerk]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Opinion]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:September 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:August 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:August 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed]
    Date Published:July 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:July 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:July 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:July 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Transcript]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certify Class]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Pretrial Statement]
    Date Published:June 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Adjourn Conference]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Initial Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Become Party Plaintiff]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Issuance of Summons]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?454144
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =