open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York

NEW YORK PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1-19-40214-ess
    Party Name:Anna M. Contizano
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCord, Richard J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing with Chapter 7 Discharge and Chapter 7 Final Decree]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCord, Richard J. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCord, Richard J. [Discharging Debtor Ch7 and Final Decree Ch7]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCord, Richard J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds Collected]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCord, Richard J. [Certificate of Debtor Education or Offical Form 423 Certification About a Financial Mgmt Course]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCord, Richard J. [Employee Income Records / Copies of Pay Statements]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCord, Richard J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCord, Richard J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCord, Richard J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCord, Richard J. [Request for Notice - Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCord, Richard J. [Deficient Filing Chapter 7]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCord, Richard J. [Automatic docket of credit card/debit card]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCord, Richard J. [Judge - Trustee - 341 Meeting Assignment (Chapter 7 No Asset) (Auto Assign)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCord, Richard J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCord, Richard J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: McCord, Richard J. [Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y LBR 2017-1]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nyeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?464793
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =