U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smoot
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 17, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 13, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 10, 2023: [Hearing ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Suppress ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 10, 2023: [In Limine ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 22, 2022: [Omnibus Hearing ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 22, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 21, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 04, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Recusal]
  • October 13, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • October 13, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 09, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 09, 2022: [Transcript]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Conditions of Release]
  • September 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 06, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 04, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 02, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 26, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.