U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-bk-11853-
  • Case Name: Glenda Arlene Hamby
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [Case Closed (BK)]
September, 2017
  • September 23, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [Determine Final Cure and Mortgage Paymen]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [Determine Final Cure and Mortgage Payment re Rule 3002.1]
  • August 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1 (With Proof of Claim Filed)]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment (batch)]
  • June 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [Returned Paper Mail]
  • June 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket]
  • June 05, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • June 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [Certification Regarding Domestic Support Obligations]
  • June 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [Vacating Order]
  • May 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [File Domestic Support and Financial Mgmt Course Certification]
  • May 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Certificate of Final Payment]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [Motion and Order to Substitute Attorney (batch)]
December, 2016
  • December 24, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket]
  • December 22, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [Confirming Modified Plan]
  • December 22, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [Hearing Held (BK)]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket]
  • November 18, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [Trustee's Motion to Modify Confirmed Plan]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket]
  • October 24, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [Agreed Order]
  • October 22, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [Agreed Order]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • April 18, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2016
  • March 04, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket]
  • March 02, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: West, Kara L. [To Employer (Wage Order)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.